LA HB470 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an expedited motor vehicle title process (EN +$256,500 SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for an expedited motor vehicle title process (EN +$256,500 SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 470, ADOPT (#1014) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 470, MOTION TO ADOPT (#928) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-06-19 - House - House Vote on HB 470, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#719) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 470, FINAL PASSAGE (#546) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 470, FINAL PASSAGE (#75) (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 470, MOTION TO ADOPT (#928) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-06-19 - House - House Vote on HB 470, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#719) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 470, FINAL PASSAGE (#546) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 470, FINAL PASSAGE (#75) (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-28 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 288. | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 1. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2011-06-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/23/2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference committee report received. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Erdey, Martiny, and McPherson. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | House conferees appointed: Henry Burns, Hutter, and Downs. | |
2011-06-19 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/16/2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/15/2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-07 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2011. | |
2011-05-04 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |