LA HB467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to allocation to dependents
Title
Provides relative to allocation to dependents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported favorably (8-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |