LA HB465 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to extending existing preliminary investigations of abuse and neglect to include an immediate assessment of certain visitation orders, custody orders, or agreements involving an alleged perpetrator and the child (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to extending existing preliminary investigations of abuse and neglect to include an immediate assessment of certain visitation orders, custody orders, or agreements involving an alleged perpetrator and the child (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 465, FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 465, FINAL PASSAGE (#417) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 465, FINAL PASSAGE (#417) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 189. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2011. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-05-19 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-05-18 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |