LA HB460 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows full size trawl gear for bait shrimp on permitted vessels
Title
Allows full size trawl gear for bait shrimp on permitted vessels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#130) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |