LA HB460 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 05/16/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to mailing of official correspondence by the office of alcohol and tobacco control (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to mailing of official correspondence by the office of alcohol and tobacco control (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House Vote on HB 460 FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HouseEffective date: 05/16/2014.
2014-05-16HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 69.
2014-05-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2014-05-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2014-05-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2014-05-05HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2014-05-01SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-04-24SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-04-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-04-22SenateReported favorably.
2014-04-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2014-04-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2014-04-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
2014-04-01HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-03-31HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2014-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2014-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=HB460&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=877293
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=886685
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=899440
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905748
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=915002
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=877345
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=881232
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=886868
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=887417
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=899990
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=900392
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905751
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=916642
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=891120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=899391

Bill Comments

feedback