LA HB459 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for changes to the powers, duties, limitations, and processes of the Public Service Commission
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for changes to the powers, duties, limitations, and processes of the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB459 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=683853 |