LA HB452 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the termination of the TOPS-Tech Award beginning with the 2029-2030 award year (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the termination of the TOPS-Tech Award beginning with the 2029-2030 award year (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R] | Rep. Ken Brass [D] | Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R] | Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R] |
Rep. Charles Owen [R] | Rep. Joseph Stagni [R] | Rep. Sylvia Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |