LA HB450 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for pay equality
Title
Provides for pay equality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2016-03-22 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |