LA HB443 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date: June 24, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date: June 24, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to specified campuses designated as part of the La. Technical College and for certain transfers to Delgado Community College
Title
Provides relative to specified campuses designated as part of the La. Technical College and for certain transfers to Delgado Community College
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Hutter [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 443, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1430) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 443, FINAL PASSAGE (#1118) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 443, FINAL PASSAGE (#430) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 443, FINAL PASSAGE (#1118) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 443, FINAL PASSAGE (#430) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Effective date: June 24, 2010. | |
2010-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 521. | |
2010-06-16 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-25 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-29 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-27 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-21 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Notice given. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 21, 2010. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |