LA HB436 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals requirements for the Department of Insurance to maintain a central database for contact information on life insurance policies in force in the state
Title
Repeals requirements for the Department of Insurance to maintain a central database for contact information on life insurance policies in force in the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 436 FINAL PASSAGE (#333) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 436 FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 436 FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 28. |
2021-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |