LA HB415 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Veto message from the Governor received and read.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Veto message from the Governor received and read.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to central bank digital currency
Title
Provides relative to central bank digital currency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-18 - House - House Vote on HB 415 PASS BILL SUBSEQUENT TO VETO (#19) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-07-18 - House - House Vote on HB 415 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#16) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-07-18 - House - House Vote on HB 415 MOTION TO CONSIDER (#13) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 415 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1081) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 415 FINAL PASSAGE (#818) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 415 FINAL PASSAGE (#488) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-07-18 - House - House Vote on HB 415 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#16) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-07-18 - House - House Vote on HB 415 MOTION TO CONSIDER (#13) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 415 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1081) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 415 FINAL PASSAGE (#818) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 415 FINAL PASSAGE (#488) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Veto message from the Governor received and read. |
2023-07-18 | House | Veto message read, roll called on final consideration. 69 yeas, 29 nays. Not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the veto was not overridden. |
2023-07-18 | House | Reconsidered. |
2023-07-18 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-07-18 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-06-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023. |
2023-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2023-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |