LA HB407 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the payment of consent judgment against the Department of Transportation and Development in the suit entitled Daisy Horton Holmes, et al. v. Lloyd Harris, et al.
Title
Appropriates funds for the payment of consent judgment against the Department of Transportation and Development in the suit entitled Daisy Horton Holmes, et al. v. Lloyd Harris, et al.
Sponsors
Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |