LA HB400 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts, under specified fiscal conditions, a local school board from complying with the requirement that the board permit certain employees to take up to 90 days of extended sick leave
Title
Exempts, under specified fiscal conditions, a local school board from complying with the requirement that the board permit certain employees to take up to 90 days of extended sick leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB400 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=683765 |