LA HB396 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Effective date: May 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to traffic signals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to traffic signals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 396, FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-29HouseEffective date: May 29, 2013.
2013-05-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 43.
2013-05-21HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-05-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-05-16SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-14SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-13SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-08SenateReported favorably.
2013-04-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2013-04-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-04-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2013.
2013-04-10HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-09HouseReported with amendments (18-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2013-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB396&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=834245
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836789
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838831
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848913
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=853545
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836656
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836714
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837204
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=834270
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836997
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838852
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=860499
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848742

Bill Comments

feedback