LA HB394 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the salaries of registrars of voters and their chief deputies and confidential assistants (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the salaries of registrars of voters and their chief deputies and confidential assistants (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 394 FINAL PASSAGE (#941) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |