LA HB391 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana in raw or crude form and limits the dispensing of such product

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana in raw or crude form and limits the dispensing of such product

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 391 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#931) (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#574) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21HouseEffective date: 01/01/2022.
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 424.
2021-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 75, nays 18, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-01HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
2021-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-27SenateReconsidered.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-17SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-13SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-12SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably (12-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB391&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210608
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216794
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231022
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235925
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224756
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210621
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216854
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229704
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237207
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229209
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229216
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230906

Bill Comments

feedback