LA HB390 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement rates paid to providers of disability services (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Relative to reimbursement rates paid to providers of disability services (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 390 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1042) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 390 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#898) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#810) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#555) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 390 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#898) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#810) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#555) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 381. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee members discharged. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee. |
2019-06-06 | House | Discharged from Conference Committee. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Luneau, Mills, and Donahue. |
2019-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: White, Hoffmann, and Henry. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |