LA HB386 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Dept. of Economic Development to report annually certain information on business growth in the state of La.
Title
Requires the Dept. of Economic Development to report annually certain information on business growth in the state of La.
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Hutter [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 386, FINAL PASSAGE (#1205) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 386, FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 386, FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-26 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-20 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-13 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | Prefiled. |