LA HB384 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the grace period applicable to penalties for lapse of compulsory motor vehicle liability security (EN -$216,125 RV See Note)
Title
Extends the grace period applicable to penalties for lapse of compulsory motor vehicle liability security (EN -$216,125 RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 384 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1180) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#162) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 384 FINAL PASSAGE (#162) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 426. |
2024-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/21/2024. |
2024-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |