LA HB383 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits liability of operators of motor vehicles for harm caused to certain persons who are injured while illegally blocking a road or highway
Title
Limits liability of operators of motor vehicles for harm caused to certain persons who are injured while illegally blocking a road or highway
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Galle [R] | Rep. Beryl Amedee [R] | Rep. Mike Bayham [R] | Rep. Beth Billings [R] |
Rep. Chad Boyer [R] | Rep. Dewith Carrier [R] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] | Rep. Raymond Crews [R] |
Rep. Peter Egan [R] | Rep. Julie Emerson [R] | Rep. Gabe Firment [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] |
Rep. John Illg [R] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Danny McCormick [R] | Rep. Charles Owen [R] |
Rep. Roger Wilder [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 AMENDMENT # 2586 BY KNOX MOTION TO ADOPT (#304) (Y: 33 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 SUSPEND THE RULES (#303) (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 AMENDMENT # 2586 BY KNOX MOTION TO ADOPT (#304) (Y: 33 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 383 SUSPEND THE RULES (#303) (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (11-0-1). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |