LA HB381 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Department of Transportation and Development spending
Title
Provides relative to Department of Transportation and Development spending
Sponsors
Rep. Jacob Braud [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 381 FINAL PASSAGE (#51) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/2024. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |