LA HB380 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a fee increase for the issuance and renewal of certain identification cards (EG +$416,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes a fee increase for the issuance and renewal of certain identification cards (EG +$416,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-20 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |