LA HB374 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to residential lessee screening

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to residential lessee screening

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 374 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2021-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB374&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210490
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217558
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220216
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216966
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217521
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217740
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219778
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210517
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217627
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220237
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220020

Bill Comments 750

feedback