LA HB367 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the month of April as Native Plant Month in Louisiana
Title
Recognizes the month of April as Native Plant Month in Louisiana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 367 FINAL PASSAGE (#301) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |