LA HB351 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the song "Southern Nights" by Allen Toussaint as the official state cultural song

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the song "Southern Nights" by Allen Toussaint as the official state cultural song

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 351 FINAL PASSAGE (#819) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 351 FINAL PASSAGE (#848) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 471.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-06SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-27HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-26HouseNotice given.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-20HouseNotice given.
2021-05-19HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-19HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
2021-05-18HouseNotice given.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2021-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB351&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209943
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221837
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229545
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232779
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236383
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222245
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222979
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224760
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227472
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209948
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222093
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229713
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237325
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232148

Bill Comments

feedback