LA HB350 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the surety bond required for third-party testers administering driving skills tests for Class "A", "B", or "C" driver's licenses
Title
Provides relative to the surety bond required for third-party testers administering driving skills tests for Class "A", "B", or "C" driver's licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 350 FINAL PASSAGE (#574) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 350 FINAL PASSAGE (#396) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 350 FINAL PASSAGE (#396) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 216. |
2019-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |