LA HB344 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a surcharge on credit card transactions
Title
Prohibits a surcharge on credit card transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 344, FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 344, AMENDMENT B-30A, MOTION TO ADOPT (#111) (Y: 43 N: 47 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 344, AMENDMENT B-26, MOTION TO ADOPT (#110) (Y: 47 N: 43 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 344, AMENDMENT B-30A, MOTION TO ADOPT (#111) (Y: 43 N: 47 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 344, AMENDMENT B-26, MOTION TO ADOPT (#110) (Y: 47 N: 43 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 12, 2010. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-06 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | Prefiled. |