LA HB33 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2018-2019 for the expenses of the legislature (Item #4)
Title
Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2018-2019 for the expenses of the legislature (Item #4)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 33 FINAL PASSAGE (#70) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 33 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 33 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-06-18 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2018-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-06-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-31 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/18. |
2018-05-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (22-0). |
2018-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |