LA HB31 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Dedicates a certain amount of state nonrecurring revenue to state retirement systems for supplemental benefit payments (RR GF EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Dedicates a certain amount of state nonrecurring revenue to state retirement systems for supplemental benefit payments (RR GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#914) (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-01-28 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/28/2022. |
2022-01-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-01-27 | House | Prefiled. |