LA HB301 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers the La. Tax Commission to the division of administration and grants the commission certain authority regarding its management and operations (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Transfers the La. Tax Commission to the division of administration and grants the commission certain authority regarding its management and operations (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 301, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1752) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 301, FINAL PASSAGE (#1683) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 301, FINAL PASSAGE (#869) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 301, FINAL PASSAGE (#1683) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 301, FINAL PASSAGE (#869) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective date: July 1, 2010. | |
2010-06-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 573. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 82, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-19 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-18 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-10 | Notice given. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 7, 2010. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-03-31 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-11 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-11 | Prefiled. |