LA HB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-28-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 01/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-28-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 01/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a U.S. military identification card may be used at the polls for voting purposes (EN +$110,200 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides that a U.S. military identification card may be used at the polls for voting purposes (EN +$110,200 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#836) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 30 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2020. |
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 133. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019. |
2019-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |