LA HB295 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to immovable property in successions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to immovable property in successions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#550) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#64) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-07-20HouseVeto message read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-06-29HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
2021-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-26SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2021-05-20SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-05-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-05SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-04SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2021-04-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021.
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-21HouseReported with amendments (11-0-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-30HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-03-30HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB295&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208960
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215989
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217389
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228870
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215793
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215930
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216581
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208989
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216225
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217572
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236622
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237075
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217369
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228710

Bill Comments

feedback