LA HB295 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a magistrate judge in the 14th JDC (EG +$165,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a magistrate judge in the 14th JDC (EG +$165,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-02HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback