LA HB295 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an increase in court costs in the mayor's court for the town of Mansura
Title
Authorizes an increase in court costs in the mayor's court for the town of Mansura
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 ADOPT (#1033) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 295 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#930) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 295 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#722) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#637) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#166) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 295 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#930) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 295 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#722) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#637) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#166) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 382. |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Nevers, and LaFleur. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Johnson, Arnold, and St. Germain. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Senate amendments were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |