LA HB29 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to Firefighters' Retirement System's Deferred Retirement Option Plan and unfunded accrued liability (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to Firefighters' Retirement System's Deferred Retirement Option Plan and unfunded accrued liability (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 29 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1009) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#691) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#439) (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 250.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-02SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-25SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-24SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-13HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseReported with amendments (7-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-02-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2021.
2021-02-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-02-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB29&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200973
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221998
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224733
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232546
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235432
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214940
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216314
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214442
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221984
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222229
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222608
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227415
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1200981
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212415
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222066
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222833
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224909
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225116
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227479
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228191
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231539
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233154
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231023
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232359

Bill Comments 750

feedback