LA HB279 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for differential Taylor Opportunity Program for Students award amounts for certain students based on their classification level (OR DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for differential Taylor Opportunity Program for Students award amounts for certain students based on their classification level (OR DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |