LA HB263 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes judges of the City Court of Shreveport to serve as an attorney member of a medical review panel
Title
Authorizes judges of the City Court of Shreveport to serve as an attorney member of a medical review panel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 263 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1016) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#704) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#311) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#704) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#311) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-07-20 | House | Veto message read. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-07-01 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |