LA HB251 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires provision of cost estimates to patients for procedures at hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Requires provision of cost estimates to patients for procedures at hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] | Rep. Scott Simon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (12-2). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-21 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. |
2014-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |