LA HB248 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Decreases probation and parole fees for certain offenders (EG DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decreases probation and parole fees for certain offenders (EG DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 248 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-04-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-28HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback