LA HB247 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to criminal penalties for accepting overpayment of unemployment benefits
Title
Provides relative to criminal penalties for accepting overpayment of unemployment benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 247 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (9-5). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |