LA HB246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the storage of hydrogen in underground reservoirs and salt domes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the storage of hydrogen in underground reservoirs and salt domes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 246 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#889) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#277) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-02SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-02SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Hensgens, Hewitt, and Bouie.
2021-06-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: Coussan, Bishop, and Bourriaque.
2021-06-01SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-05HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-05-04HouseNotice given.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback