LA HB245 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a public entity to reject the lowest bid on a procurement contract when a vendor engages in a boycott of Israel (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a public entity to reject the lowest bid on a procurement contract when a vendor engages in a boycott of Israel (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 245 FINAL PASSAGE (#215) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-08HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably (18-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB245&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119478
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128269
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132680
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130881
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119499
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129444
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132735
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132939
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132830

Bill Comments

feedback