LA HB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain crimes and delinquency provisions when the offender is under the age of eighteen (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to certain crimes and delinquency provisions when the offender is under the age of eighteen (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 241 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#761) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#491) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#491) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 104. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-05-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19. |
2019-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0-1). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |