LA HB237 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Faubourg Marigny Security and Improvement District in Orleans Parish
Title
Provides relative to the Faubourg Marigny Security and Improvement District in Orleans Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 237 FINAL PASSAGE (#566) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-11 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |