LA HB230 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the deadline for applying for rebates in the Louisiana Quality Jobs Program (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Extends the deadline for applying for rebates in the Louisiana Quality Jobs Program (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 230 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1527) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Vote on HB 230 FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Vote on HB 230 FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |