LA HB225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain substances in the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law
Title
Provides relative to certain substances in the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#536) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#261) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#261) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 100. |
2017-06-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |