LA HB225 | 2010 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB1460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Becomes HB 1460.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Becomes HB 1460.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS), allows a retiree to designate a trust as beneficiary of retirement benefits (OR NO IMPA)
Title
Relative to the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS), allows a retiree to designate a trust as beneficiary of retirement benefits (OR NO IMPA)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Becomes HB 1460. | |
2010-04-22 | Reported by substitute (8-0) (Regular) | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-09 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2010-03-09 | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1460 (Replaced by) 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB225 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=680882 |