LA HB224 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits ownership of any animal by a person who has been convicted of cruelty to animals
Title
Prohibits ownership of any animal by a person who has been convicted of cruelty to animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1231) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#488) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#488) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 551. |
2024-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |