LA HB223 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to abuse among dating partners (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to abuse among dating partners (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 223 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#696) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#535) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#284) (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#535) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#284) (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 84. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 66, nays 32, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17. |
2017-05-08 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-08 | House | Notice removed |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17. |
2017-05-03 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (10-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |