LA HB221 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the jurisdiction of mayor's courts to include the collection of municipal utility debts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the jurisdiction of mayor's courts to include the collection of municipal utility debts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#361) (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-15HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback